Financial history HALABJA COMMUNITY PLAY PROJECT

Charity number: 1132672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £81 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £20.49k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A