Financial history PAINTERS COMPANY CHARITIES

Charity number: 1135314
Charity reporting is up to date (125 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £429.64k £100.09k £296.40k £101.26k £95.05k
Total expenditure £74.32k £68.28k £99.90k £81.42k £59.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A