Financial history THE GLOBAL WARMING POLICY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1131448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £374.33k £387.49k £390.63k £279.93k £275.36k
Total expenditure £364.24k £279.87k £407.88k £432.50k £425.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A