HEAR US

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hear Us is Croydon's Mental Health Service User Group which acts as a coordinating body to facilitate, and ensure service users involvement in, the planning, delivery and monitoring of mental health services in Croydon. Helping to improve the quality of the services commissioned and delivered in Croydon objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £139,099 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 15 April 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Goreing | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Halimah Sadia Zakiuddin | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Russell | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Millicent Isola Reid | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Ashton | Trustee | 23 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Niall Eugene McVeigh | Trustee | 23 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josh Baker-Mendoza | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abeline Greene | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cassandra Austin | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.14k | £191.53k | £244.73k | £260.93k | £361.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.67k | £147.18k | £181.00k | £242.91k | £300.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £12.04k | N/A | £107.00k | £107.00k | £139.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 1 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES AND ADVICE 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ABOUT MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITH THE OBJECT OF CREATING AWARENESS AND REDUCING THE STIGMA ATTACHED TO MENTAL HEALTH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orhard House
15a Purley Road
South Croydon
Surrey
---
CR2 6EZ
- Phone:
- 02086816888
- Email:
- hello@hear-us.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window