Trustees Harborough Cinema

Charity number: 1133139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Jane Kersey Trustee 14 March 2025
LEICESTER ARTS CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
Robert Morris Trustee 03 July 2023
None on record
Margaret Shuter Trustee 17 March 2023
HARBOROUGH TWENTY 12 LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Received: On time
Alastair Roy Upcraft Trustee 17 March 2023
None on record
Avril Yvonne Pell Trustee 12 March 2021
None on record
Ann Petronella Height OBE Trustee 15 April 2019
None on record
MICHAEL JAMES TAYLOR Trustee 10 March 2017
None on record
MURIEL SUNNIVA BIBBY Trustee 02 May 2013
None on record
Peter John Mitchell Trustee
None on record
GRAHAM RONALD POWELL Trustee
Great Bowden Village Hall
Received: On time