Financial history FAMILY BUSINESS RESEARCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1134085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £177.00k £143.43k £122.00k £178.56k £157.72k
Total expenditure £165.70k £145.94k £126.44k £145.53k £128.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A