Financial history THE DIMA FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1132940
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £12.49k £6.72k £3.80k £3.17k £17.99k
Total expenditure £8.06k £60 £25.05k £13 £15.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A