WALTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Village Hall facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Rachel Aiton | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
William Weaver | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRIAN HOGG | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Pamela Margaret Cronin | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.85k | £30.81k | £11.02k | £23.00k | £6.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.14k | £9.42k | £3.51k | £7.04k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.80k | £8.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2023 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 April 2025 | 1169 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2023 | 732 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WALTON IN THE COUNTY OF CUMBRIA (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
CUMBRIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
WALTON VILLAGE HALL
WALTON
BRAMPTON
CA8 2DJ
- Phone:
- 07798815166
- Email:
- wweaver@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window