Financial history THE WORTHYS YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1136554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £53.46k £35.81k £38.82k £62.08k £67.66k
Total expenditure £44.19k £25.58k £50.56k £58.37k £66.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A