Financial history THE DICK WHITE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1135994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.17k £7.02k £5.37k £79.89k £16.91k
Total expenditure £5.17k £6.36k £5.78k £6.72k £49.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A