Financial history CAMBRIDGE METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1134226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £281.63k £234.74k £272.17k £297.78k £279.30k
Total expenditure £326.76k £299.01k £318.33k £320.61k £355.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A