Trustees HINCKLEY METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1134382

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
42 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL ANDREW LOMAX | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Charles Haddon | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALAN KEITH WARE | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ruth Robinson | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Elizabeth Mason | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Joy Ware | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian David Stone | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Jane Birkby | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Bland | Trustee | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen Andrew Hoggar | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER GEOFFREY BALL | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Patricia Mukorombindo | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Susan Ann Cooper | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Gwendolen Jill Coley | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Richard Charles Smith | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Sarah Pither | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ann Cobb | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Mandy Prosser | Trustee | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANN JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Malcolm Arthur Lapper | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Merrill | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Val Freestone | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Fred Hartshorn | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Sheila Mary Grice | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR KENNETH BENNETT | Trustee | 17 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA JEAN HALLAM | Trustee | 09 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Chris Webb | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL SCARBOROUGH | Trustee | 23 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK HOLYLAND | Trustee | 23 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH WATTS | Trustee | 19 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BLACK | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ARMSTRONG | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|||||
MRS ANNE HADDON | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|||||
MR PETE WHITE | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUTH PEACH CERT ED | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN ANN LLOYD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS URSULA COX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR WILL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL RAYMOND HOLT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.