THE METHODIST CHURCH - BOLTON CIRCUIT

Charity Number: 1134395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing ministerial and other support for Methodist churches in the Bolton Circuit

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £323,810
Total expenditure: £330,135

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackburn With Darwen
  • Bolton
  • Bury

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 February 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

48 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Christopher Neil Pritchard Chair 01 September 2022
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
BOLTON AND ROCHDALE METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: 54 days late
HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Christine Tickle Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Peter Egerton Holland Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Jeffrey Thomas Layer Trustee 06 February 2025
None on record
Simon Skidmore Trustee 04 November 2024
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Rev Robert Kasema Trustee 01 September 2024
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
THE TRIANGLE COMMUNITY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Glen Carl Atkinson Trustee 01 September 2024
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Paul Raymond Cohen Trustee 01 September 2024
C.A.T.S. YOUTH THEATRE
Received: On time
Susan Snowden Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Brian Gordon Jackson Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Helen Bolton Trustee 05 December 2023
BOLTON AND ROCHDALE METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: 54 days late
Rev Sarah Anne Hooks Trustee 01 September 2023
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Sharon Elizabeth Harbottle BA Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Arnold T Samhungu Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
George Howard Stanton Masters BSc Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Ann Smith Trustee 01 November 2022
HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Dr John Anthony Harbottle Trustee 01 September 2022
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Graham Geoffrey Ashford Trustee 01 September 2022
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
John Charles Skipworth Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Kathleen Mabel Glen Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Charles Edward Venables Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Fiona Elizabeth Gorton Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Hilda Keenan Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Jeffrey Millington Trustee 01 September 2021
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Graham Smith Trustee 01 September 2021
HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Derek Jones Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Mary Riley Trustee 01 September 2020
BOLTON SAMARITANS
Received: On time
HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
GLENNYS ELIZABETH ASTLEY Trustee 01 January 2020
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Kirstin Louise Middleton Trustee 01 January 2020
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Peter Dennis Firth Trustee 01 January 2020
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
Fiona Jane Belli Trustee 01 December 2019
The Philip Lomax Charity for the poor of the chapels of the Bolton Methodist Circuit
Received: On time
HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Steven John Day Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
PATRICIA JEAN TAYLOR Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
MICHAEL JOHN BAINBRIDGE Trustee 19 August 2017
None on record
JULIE OWEN Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
FRANK WORSLEY Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Anne Slater Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Michael Hawksworth Trustee 01 October 2015
LEARN (LIFECHANGING EDUCATION FOR ALL IN RURAL NEPAL)
Received: On time
UPLIFTING NEPAL'S CHILDREN WITH LOVE AND EDUCATION
Received: On time
MAUREEN HAWKSWORTH Trustee 01 September 2015
UPLIFTING NEPAL'S CHILDREN WITH LOVE AND EDUCATION
Received: On time
LEARN (LIFECHANGING EDUCATION FOR ALL IN RURAL NEPAL)
Received: On time
Peter Green Trustee 23 September 2013
HARWOOD METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
SIMEON CENTRE COUNSELLING SERVICE
Received: On time
REVEREND ANNE CASH Trustee 15 September 2013
None on record
DAVID HARTLEY Trustee 24 June 2013
None on record
MARTIN ANTHONY MERCER Trustee
None on record
COLIN NELSON Trustee
THE SHAW CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE TRIANGLE COMMUNITY METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
HELEN LOUISE CHARLTON Trustee
None on record
GILLIAN PATRICIA PLATT Trustee
None on record
DOUG HEARN Trustee
None on record
HELEN MARY STUART Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £664.84k £835.42k £305.28k £315.36k £323.81k
Total expenditure £520.17k £604.53k £1.30m £344.98k £330.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £54.64k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £780.77k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £48.43k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £616.41k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £520.17k £604.53k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 29 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 09 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 October 2020 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 October 2020 100 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 Ryeburn Drive
BOLTON
BL2 3FP
Phone:
01204 301673