THE BURGON SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Futherance of education in particular through the study of academical dress in all its aspects and the publication and dissemination of research concerning academical dress.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Hogg | Chair | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terence Norman Barcock | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Andrew Martin Plant | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Horton | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip Francis Michael Goff | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valentina S Grub | Trustee | 09 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Geoffrey Williams | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Ruth Hynes | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas James Jackson | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN COOPER | Trustee | 06 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN LAWRENCE WOLGAST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.21k | £11.66k | £18.75k | £21.84k | £52.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.22k | £8.59k | £8.66k | £11.54k | £13.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE STUDY OF ACADEMICAL DRESS IN ALL ASPECTS AND THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF RESEARCH CONCERNING ACADEMICAL DRESS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Gatehill Gardens
LUTON
LU3 4EZ
- Phone:
- 01582 510954
- Email:
- secretary@burgon.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window