Financial history HUMAN CARE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1136049
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £4.79k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £522 £155 £371 £210 £8.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A