Financial history WOLVERHAMPTON METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1135146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £545.40k £476.17k £597.58k £1.36m £1.05m
Total expenditure £596.03k £621.64k £684.45k £788.26k £903.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.29k £8.65k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £23.52k N/A £1.00k £0 £2.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £516.06k N/A £471.12k £825.35k £502.14k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.82k N/A £4.51k £29.99k £65.00k
Income - Other £0 N/A £120.94k £507.99k £476.98k
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £1.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £595.04k N/A £684.45k £788.26k £903.85k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £3.50k N/A £3.09k £3.46k £21.37k
Expenditure - Grants institution £4.10k N/A £1.00k £1.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £990 N/A £0 £0 £0