Financial history ADAM'S BUCKETFUL OF HOPE APPEAL LTD

Charity Number: 1136641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £50.99k £51.60k £56.08k £81.45k £76.22k
Total expenditure £49.79k £50.04k £56.23k £76.64k £88.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.11k £10.00k £4.50k N/A N/A