Trustees ADAM'S BUCKETFUL OF HOPE APPEAL LTD
Charity Number: 1136641

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Ann Cornish | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Tudor | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Babak Ghoreishi | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chander Bhan | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bianca Alexandra Baciu | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Maxine Dufresnoy | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ionut Claudiu Baciu | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Alderson | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Fitzgerald | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Roberta Ross-Harper | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.