NORTHERN LIGHTS SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Orchestra, advertisment and promotion. Venue hire and design. Lighting and recording.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 14 June 2010: Standard registration
- 10 May 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.63k | £34.31k | £27.31k | £1.36k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.95k | £29.98k | £33.12k | £642 | £985 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ARTS, CULTURE AND EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION AND PERFORMANCE OF PUBLIC CONCERTS, THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION OUTREACH PROGRAMMES AND BY ENCOURAGING AN APPRECIATION OF AND A INTEREST IN MUSIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING , ORCHESTRAL MUSIC COMPOSED BY PERSONS BORN WITHIN THE COUNTRIES AND REGIONS FROM WHICH THE NORTHERN LIGHTS, ALSO KNOWN AS THE AURORA BOREALIS CAN BE SEEN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window