SEMILIKI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Semilki Trust has been established to: Relieve sickness and human suffering and to promote health. Prevent and relieve poverty. Advance religion and promote reconcilliation. It supports projects, primarily in East Africa with which it's members have a personal contact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 12 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSS SAUNDERS | Chair |
|
||||||
Sam Pearson | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Ruth Elizabeth Lockley | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Saunders | Trustee | 04 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT NEWBURY WENDOVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Katherine Moira Goodacre | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER NEIL CAMPBELL PEARSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.99k | £59.30k | £103.68k | £78.22k | £75.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.70k | £68.73k | £84.50k | £81.14k | £58.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 10 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND HUMAN SUFFERING AND TO PROMOTE HEALTH 2 TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY 3 TO ADVANCE RELIGION 4 ANY OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THAT ARE CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COURTYARD
HIGHER LOVELYNCH
MILVERTON
TAUNTON
TA4 1NP
- Phone:
- 07771795046
- Email:
- hello@semiliki-trust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window