Centre for Governance and Scrutiny

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Centre for Governance and Scrutiny (CfGS) is social purpose consultancy and national centre of expertise. Our purpose is to help organisations achieve their outcomes through improved governance and scrutiny.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£697,504
Donations and legacies | £204.95k | |
Charitable activities | £480.28k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £12.28k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£774,245
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £774.25k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £477,860 from 94 government contract(s) and £204,949 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £774.25k |
People

7 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2010: Standard registration
- THE CENTRE FOR PUBLIC SCRUTINY LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor James Dawson | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Radhika Vaidya-Sahdev | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Baker | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Noel Burns | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Catherine HOWE | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Chasey CARR-WEST | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ruth Bailey | Trustee | 31 January 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £832.50k | £617.69k | £571.93k | £576.64k | £697.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £729.39k | £548.84k | £531.47k | £596.18k | £774.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £17.85k | N/A | N/A | £269.45k | £477.86k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £180.00k | £204.95k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £3.62k | £180.00k | £204.95k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £831.57k | £617.69k | £567.99k | £392.84k | £480.28k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £3.62k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £935 | £0 | £315 | £3.80k | £12.28k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £729.39k | £548.84k | £531.47k | £596.18k | £774.25k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £300.05k | £371.32k | £413.66k | £389.80k | £331.93k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £55.18k | £57.60k | £59.48k | £55.16k | £74.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 February 2024 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 MARCH 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JUL 2020 as amended on 22 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF PUBLIC SCRUTINY, GOVERNANCE AND ACCOUNTABILITY, WHETHER WITHIN OR OUTSIDE OF THE PUBLIC SECTOR, INCLUDING SCRUTINY BY ANY STAKEHOLDER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAINTAINING A NATIONAL CENTRE OF EXPERTISE AND PROMOTING NATIONAL DEBATE AND NETWORKS; 3.2 TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE AND EFFICIENT PUBLIC ADMINISTRATION OF GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF AND IMPROVING THE PRACTICE OF PUBLIC SCRUTINY, GOVERNANCE AND ACCOUNTABILITY WITHIN GOVERNMENT AND THE DELIVERY OF PUBLIC SERVICES AND BY PROMOTING STANDARDS OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT AMONGST THOSE ENGAGED IN THE PROVISION OF AND ADVICE AND SERVICES IN THE FIELD OF PUBLIC SCRUTINY, GOVERNANCE AND ACCOUNTABILITY; AND 3.3 TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ETHICAL STANDARDS OF CONDUCT, ACCEPTED PRINCIPLES OF GOOD GOVERNANCE AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE LAW BY GOVERNMENTAL, INDUSTRIAL, COMMERCIAL, VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND PROFESSIONAL ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fourth Floor
77 Mansell Street
LONDON
E1 8AN
- Phone:
- 07869 717190
- Email:
- info@cfgs.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window