Financial history FEDERATION OF LEADERS IN SPECIAL EDUCATION

Charity number: 1137564
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.41k £22.64k £29.73k £30.24k £26.74k
Total expenditure £27.38k £21.29k £23.67k £27.26k £24.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A