FEDERATION OF LEADERS IN SPECIAL EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The FLSE works with those people who are delivering education, welfare, care, support and guidance to these children and young adults with special education needs and disabilities, wherever they are, throughout their educational years. We provide a framework for extensive dialogue between all those providing special education services and the government, through the DfE, and local authorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Hewitt | Chair | 21 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Common | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul McLean | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Charlotte Whysall | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|||||
James Waller | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Mullan | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
BARRY PAYNE | Trustee | 11 February 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.41k | £22.64k | £29.73k | £30.24k | £26.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.38k | £21.29k | £23.67k | £27.26k | £24.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 17 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NO SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THOSE OBJECTS BY:- (1) PROMOTING HIGH QUALITY STANDARDS OF SERVICE, ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT WITHIN ITS MEMBERSHIP. (2) PROMOTING AND REPRESENTING THE INTERESTS OF LEADERS IN SPECIAL EDUCATION. (3) ENCOURAGING THE SHARING AND DEVELOPMENT OF GOOD PRACTICE AND COLLABORATION BETWEEN MEMBERS THROUGH NETWORKING.
Area of benefit
GOVERNMENT REGIONS - SOUTH, SOUTH WEST, LONDON, EAST, EAST MIDLANDS, WEST MIDLANDS, NORTH WEST, NORTH EAST, YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE AND THE SOUTH EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holmlea
Middle Road
Wildmoor
BROMSGROVE
Worcestershire
B61 0BS
- Phone:
- 01603 441126
- Email:
- info@flse.education
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window