Financial history THE KENDRAY TRUST

Charity number: 1137488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £80.41k £143.05k £133.66k £136.65k £138.35k
Total expenditure £72.20k £83.96k £95.75k £113.02k £100.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A