Accounts and annual returns ESSEX CRICKET FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1138269
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 January 2025 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 January 2025 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 January 2024 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 January 2024 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 February 2023 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 February 2023 93 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 February 2022 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 February 2022 108 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window