Trustees ESSEX CRICKET FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1138269

Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Elizabeth Hargreaves | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Canon Dr John Andrew Spence CBE DL | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Thomas Churchill | Trustee | 05 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Carol Heley | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT IAN MCLINTOCK | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ALAN GOOCH | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BARNES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.