Accounts and annual returns NASEER-UD-DEEN TRUST

Charity number: 1127299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2025 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 January 2025 354 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2025 719 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 March 2022 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 05 April 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2022 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 April 2022 429 days late Download Open in new window