Financial history NASEER-UD-DEEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1127299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £38.19k £31.10k £8.46k £30.03k £39.31k
Total expenditure £38.90k £28.50k £8.80k £22.84k £32.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A