Financial history THE BAPTIST UNION OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1125912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.93m £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.15m £2.80m £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.12m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.18m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £525.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £100.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £569.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.09m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £288.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.52m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A