Accounts and annual returns FARNHAM BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1126264
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 May 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 04 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On Time