Trustees CROXLEY GREEN BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1126351

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Hofer | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Hilsden | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stephen David Elmes | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Alice Mead | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sutton | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Baldwin | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Fowler | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Bruce Gilbert | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sara Margaret O' Shea | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH PEDRICK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.