PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KNOWLE, SOLIHULL

Charity number: 1127404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of regular Public Worship, open to all.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 January 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • KNOWLE PCC (Working name)
  • THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, ST LAWRENCE AND ST ANNE, KNOWLE IN THE DIOCESE OF BIRMINGHAM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Geoffrey Peter Lanham Chair 09 September 2019
None on record
Hugh Rollinson Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Hannah Bull Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Katherine Boyall Trustee 24 April 2024
None on record
Kelly Purdy Trustee 03 November 2023
None on record
Yuen Ting Roxanne Chung Trustee 03 November 2023
None on record
Cornelius James Thorne Trustee 03 May 2023
None on record
Rachel Susanna Carter Trustee 30 March 2022
None on record
Rev Stephen Johnson Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Rev Emily Spencer Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Claire Elizabeth Carter Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN HOUGHTON Trustee 14 October 2020
THE CORNERSTONE WORKS LTD
Received: On time
TRANSFORMATIONAL ENTERPRISE NETWORK
Received: On time
CHRISTIANITY EXPLORED
Received: On time
OCCA House
Received: 17 days late
GO CHATTER STUDIOS
Recently registered
Carol Betty Kay Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
David Charles Pickering Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Roderick Brian Street Trustee 14 October 2020
CHARITIES FOR ECCLESIASTICAL AND OTHER PURPOSES
Received: On time
KNOWLE CHURCH CLOCK TRUST
Received: On time
Stephen Mort Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
MRS LIZ WELTON Trustee
CHARITIES FOR ECCLESIASTICAL AND OTHER PURPOSES
Received: On time
KNOWLE CHURCH CLOCK TRUST
Received: On time
JULIAN MICHAEL ANDREW PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £710.15k £688.43k £666.53k £774.15k £904.83k
Total expenditure £747.59k £648.10k £694.06k £746.58k £874.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.32k £30.52k £16.49k £21.29k £26.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £540.93k £587.45k £547.76k £614.60k £723.14k
Income - Other trading activities £12.58k £2.96k £3.28k £7.24k £18.46k
Income - Charitable activities £155.33k £97.25k £115.08k £150.63k £150.25k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.31k £785 £404 £1.68k £12.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £6.86k £53.08k £7.43k £3.50k £10.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £741.58k £645.16k £691.15k £740.39k £873.17k
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.01k £2.94k £2.91k £6.18k £1.41k
Expenditure - Governance £3.96k £3.90k £4.13k £3.60k £3.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution £31.68k £33.57k £32.50k £37.81k £39.12k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.37m £1.34m £1.30m £1.27m £1.26m
Long-term investments £1.35k £1.48k £1.74k £1.58k £1.78k
Other assets £298.89k £367.08k £377.05k £458.19k £475.90k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £28.74k £20.28k £25.52k £48.89k £24.03k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1717 High Street
Knowle
SOLIHULL
B93 0LN
Phone:
01564779123