THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST BURSCOUGH BRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work in the community. School assemblies. Youth clubs. Senior citizens servicies and activities. Supporting other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

18 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 26 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S PCC BURSCOUGH BRIDGE (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Parkinson-Baxter | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline McCaul | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tom Fletcher | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Greenhalgh | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dave Emmett | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elliott Ireton | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam Taylor | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Lowcock | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Summerfield | Trustee | 24 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Frances Aspinall | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lynda Cobos Pradas | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Lever | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Baxter | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Street | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Hughes | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Short | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Francis Richard Dorling | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|||||
MARK TAYLOR | Trustee | 30 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.23k | £297.43k | £285.54k | £295.69k | £305.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £270.19k | £286.91k | £347.96k | £308.12k | £269.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. John the Baptist Church
School Lane
Burscough
ORMSKIRK
L40 4AE
- Phone:
- 01704897852
- Email:
- office@sjb-burscough.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window