Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BUDBROOKE

Charity number: 1129514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DAVID BROWN Chair
None on record
Dr Clare Watson Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
MARTIN DAVIES Trustee 01 October 2019
UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
UNITED EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Andrew Cowie Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record
Luke Thomas Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
VALERIE ROY Trustee 10 June 2013
None on record
BEN DAVIS Trustee 28 May 2011
None on record