Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH SIDCUP
Charity number: 1127351

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV THOMAS JAMES PARSONS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen John Didsbury | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ibe | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Jane Hamblyn | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bernerdine Igeoma Ekwere | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAWN WATSON | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevyn Richard Oliver | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Anita Dormer | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN STANLEY STEED | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Summers | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diane McMahon | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carole Elizabeth Hazelgrove | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Beckley | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Bertram Farrell | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Alexander Younghusband | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN EDWIN ENGLAND | Trustee | 22 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Atkinson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW MARK YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.