Accounts and annual returns CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD

Charity number: 1128728
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 03 February 2022 3 days late
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 January 2020 On Time