Financial history CENTRAL BAPTIST CHURCH CHELMSFORD

Charity number: 1128728
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £331.50k £329.58k £329.15k £352.33k £323.36k
Total expenditure £310.68k £286.14k £285.04k £368.37k £296.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A