Financial history BOURNEMOUTH SCOUT DISTRICT

Charity number: 1128103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.24k £100.34k £2.66k £9.11k £5.07k
Total expenditure £2.20k £630 £1.79k £11.35k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A