Financial history CASTAWAY-GOOLE LTD

Charity number: 1129614
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £181.46k £161.77k £150.91k £191.23k £145.18k
Total expenditure £113.74k £142.78k £182.98k £191.07k £192.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.25k £28.87k £5.34k £41.44k £4.00k