CASTAWAY-GOOLE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Castaway-Goole provides music theatre opportunities for adults and young people with learning and physical disabilities in Goole, East Riding of Yorkshire and the surrounding rural areas. Castaway currently runs two performing music theatre groups, twelve weekly workshop groups in music theatre skills and community and social activities for members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 May 2009: Standard registration
- CASTAWAY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA THORNTON | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Kevin Greenhill | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Charles Binns | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Margaret Clarke | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|||||||||
WENDY BECK | Trustee | 26 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.46k | £161.77k | £150.91k | £191.23k | £145.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.74k | £142.78k | £182.98k | £191.07k | £192.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.25k | £28.87k | £5.34k | £41.44k | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF ADULTS AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND MENTAL HEALTH DIFFICULTIES LIVING IN GOOLE, AN AREA OF SOCIAL DEPRIVATION AND RURAL ISOLATION, ACCESSIBLE OPPORTUNITIES FOR PARTICIPATION AND EDUCATION IN PERFORMING ARTS AND SUPPORTING STAGE CRAFTS WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THEIR HEALTH, WELL BEING AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
GOOLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castaway Music Theatre
Estcourt Street
Goole
DN14 5AS
- Phone:
- 01405761423
- Email:
- info@castaway-goole.co.uk
- Website:
-
castaway-goole.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window