Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CAMBERLEY ST MARY

Charity number: 1127459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £123.84k £137.23k £154.99k £136.69k £159.22k
Total expenditure £126.68k £137.68k £153.21k £131.97k £153.52k
Income from government contracts £3.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.93k £2.90k £1.50k £2.96k