Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST DORMANSLAND, SOUTHWARK

Charity number: 1127745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £73.81k £115.58k £112.16k £94.22k £502.54k
Total expenditure £82.61k £111.43k £98.83k £110.54k £106.79k
Income from government contracts £330 £528 £666 £300 £600
Income from government grants £2.50k £2.00k £4.00k £1.00k £17.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £458.90k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.51k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.77k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.37k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £384.11k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £105.81k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £980
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0