Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRENTFORD
Charity Number: 1128611

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Cheung | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Isobel Peaty | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Merrill | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessika Toto-Moukouo | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Zoe Anita Mathias | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Underwood | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope May Vincent | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Filby | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Webster | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Fletcher | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Metzner | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Charles Fletcher | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Richard Benson | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Geraldine Elizabeth Nixon | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Jewitt | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariette Theresa Wilkins | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Salisbury | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iain Stafford Knight | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ineala Theophilus | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sara Jane Ward | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev SARAH GUINNESS | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW NEWTON | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.