THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HASLEMERE

Charity number: 1127927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. The provision of activities for different age groups, with a Christian ethos.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £295,731
Total expenditure: £287,060

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HASLEMERE PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Deborah Janet Peet Trustee 24 April 2022
THE RON AND LYN PEET TRUST
Received: On time
Andrew Silk Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Simon Henry Ingram Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
David John Elliott Sewell Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
David Michael Simmons Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Geraldine Alice Lambrechts Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Katherine Baie Morgan Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
John Charles Harvey Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Gareth David Trustee 25 April 2021
FRIENDS OF THE PARISH OF HASLEMERE
Received: On time
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
HASLEMERE SCHOOLS CHARITY
Received: On time
HASLEMERE UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Rev Christopher Dixon Bessant Trustee 22 August 2019
ST BARTHOLOMEW'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FUND
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE PARISH OF HASLEMERE
Received: On time
HASLEMERE SCHOOLS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE HASLEMERE FUND
Received: On time
GUILDFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Geoffrey Martin Trustee 04 August 2019
None on record
Stephen Paul Vaughan Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Andrew Culshaw Trustee 22 April 2018
None on record
Catherine Ann Moore Trustee 15 May 2017
None on record
LINDA DONALDSON Trustee 30 April 2017
LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE HASLEMERE AND DISTRICT HOSPITAL
Received: On time
HAMISH DONALDSON MBE DL Trustee 30 April 2017
THE HASLEMERE PLAYERS
Received: On time
THE HASLEMERE PLAYERS
Received: On time
THE HASLEMERE HALL
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE PARISH OF HASLEMERE
Received: On time
HASLEMERE FESTIVAL
Received: On time
SURREY CHURCHES PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
HASLEMERE HALL
Received: 53 days late
HOWARD JOSEPH BODY Trustee 19 July 2014
None on record
Bridget Mary Middlemas Leary Trustee 03 October 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £223.42k £240.04k £286.95k £389.53k £295.73k
Total expenditure £243.30k £220.58k £259.79k £307.96k £287.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HASLEMERE PARISH OFFICE
The Link
Derby Road
HASLEMERE
GU27 1BS
Phone:
01428644578