THE STEVE SINNOTT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation is named for the late General Secretary of the National Union of Teachers (England and Wales) who died suddenly in April 2008. It continues his work by promoting the Sustainable Development Goals for education by encouraging teachers worldwide to contribute their experience and expertise to projects which advance the achievement of these goals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Cambodia
- Cape Verde
- Colombia
- Cuba
- Dominica
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Nepal
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 28 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JERRY GLAZIER | Chair |
|
||||||||
Sambhawana Tiwari-Aiyar | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Mandekh Hussein | Trustee | 05 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Sue Rayment | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Warren Andrew John Chambers | Trustee | 20 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MARY SINNOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.49k | £182.97k | £199.26k | £199.26k | £201.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.01k | £161.17k | £206.78k | £202.78k | £263.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 8 JULY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/2015
Charitable objects
3 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ACROSS THE WORLD BY SEEKING TO ENSURE ACCESS TO A FULL COURSE OF PRIMARY EDUCATION FOR ALL BOYS AND GIRLS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNITED NATIONS MILLENNIUM DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Steve Sinnott Foundation
Lord Lieutenants Charity Hub
Warner Brothers Studios
Suite 23, Building 6, Hercules Way
Leavesden
WD25 7GS
- Phone:
- 020 8013 9616
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window