THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LITTLEHAM CUM EXMOUTH

Charity number: 1128761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. The provision of youth clubs with a Christian ethos. Promoting the whole mission of the Church.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £350,632
Total expenditure: £403,654

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • LITTLEHAM CUM EXMOUTH PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Steven Charles Jones Chair 17 June 2020
LITTLEHAM-CUM-EXMOUTH ENDOWED PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
EXMOUTH WELFARE TRUST
Received: On time
CHURCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Juliet Leach Trustee 09 April 2025
None on record
Ruth Margaret Tibbetts Trustee 09 April 2025
None on record
Rev Shaun Tipton Trustee 01 July 2024
None on record
Sarah Clarke Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Nicholas Andrew White Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Biggs Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
David Alan Peers Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Timothy Biggs Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Stephen George Thomas BSc Hons Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Susan MOSELEY Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Keith Bradley MOORE Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Michael John EVERSHED Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
David Anthony KNIGHT MA Cantab Trustee 28 April 2021
None on record
Christopher Clive HOUSE BAHons Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Margaret Isobel ELMS BSc Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Debra Mary FROST Trustee 21 October 2020
None on record
Michael Goom Trustee 31 March 2014
THE EXMOUTH PLAYERS
Received: 84 days late
LITTLEHAM-CUM-EXMOUTH ENDOWED PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
PAUL RICHARD STOCK Trustee 31 March 2014
None on record
Rev Benedict Howard Cambridge Trustee 26 March 2013
LITTLEHAM-CUM-EXMOUTH ENDOWED PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
MRS SUE CARRAHAR Trustee 23 March 2012
CanCope Breast Cancer Support
Received: On time
CHURCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £418.80k £343.64k £228.89k £419.04k £350.63k
Total expenditure £384.33k £390.87k £214.71k £366.80k £403.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.25k N/A N/A N/A £22.65k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 03 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Rolle Road
Exmouth
EX8 2AB
Phone:
01395708262