Financial history HENLLYS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 500183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £17.70k £31.07k £14.55k £19.02k £24.20k
Total expenditure £17.47k £19.26k £18.65k £25.93k £27.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £23.00k N/A N/A N/A