HENLLYS VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working to provide a venue for local residents, clubs and organisations to run events, meetings and clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Torfaen
Governance
- 02 September 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RON BURNETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Valerie Ann Waters | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Elkins | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elizabeth Kerl | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Hywel Gruffydd Davies | Trustee | 03 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Malcolm Smith | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Pressley | Trustee | 05 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dennis William Henson | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr HOWARD FRANCIS FORTESCUE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Linda Alice Westerman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.70k | £31.07k | £14.55k | £19.02k | £24.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.47k | £19.26k | £18.65k | £25.93k | £27.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 MAY 1971 AS REPLACED BY A SCHEME 27 JULY 2009.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HENLLYS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HENLLYS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SECRETARY
Henllys Village Hall
Henllys Village Road
Henllys
CWMBRAN
NP44 6JZ
- Phone:
- 07771548774
- Email:
- HVHSecretary@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window