Financial history ASHBOURNE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £178.06k £115.25k £127.73k £146.35k £115.86k
Total expenditure £137.99k £120.21k £115.85k £122.62k £123.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A