Financial history EDMONTON BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1128147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £296.78k £250.40k £221.04k £245.00k £270.72k
Total expenditure £324.70k £221.04k £244.20k £205.84k £276.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A